U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHITTED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 21, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 02, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.