U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEMINGWAY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 20, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • July 25, 2022: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • January 11, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • January 06, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 15, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 10, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 15, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • August 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • June 22, 2021: [Status Conference ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 26, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 31, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.