U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHOFFNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • January 19, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • December 01, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 25, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 16, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 02, 2021: [Suppress]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 27, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 27, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.