U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 28, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • November 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 11, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 18, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • May 18, 2022: [Bench Trial ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • May 17, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 15, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice-Other]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • December 28, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 23, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 14, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.