U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Exhibit]
November, 2021
  • November 28, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Add Counts]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.