U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MONK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • May 05, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • April 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.