U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHEPHERD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Probation Petition Amended 12C/Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • March 20, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [USMS Return Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.