U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.