U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CONNELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Redact Transcript]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • February 23, 2022: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 17, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 24, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • October 01, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.