U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOLORZANO-ALVARADO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.