U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POWELL, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 05, 2021: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 27, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 14, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.