U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.