U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCUTCHEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 15, 2021: [SEALED Document]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.