U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURNETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 10, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • November 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.