U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 01, 2021: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 06, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 06, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.