U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUIZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 21, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice-Other]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.