U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMPSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Order on Probation Petition 12B]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • July 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 12, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.