U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOMEZ GOMEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 16, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Video Conference Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 13, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
  • March 29, 2021: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.