U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.