U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLAYBROOKS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • September 23, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 27, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 02, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 15, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 23, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 24, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 24, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.