U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIZKHOV
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • October 05, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • August 12, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 06, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 19, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • January 18, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • January 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 07, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • September 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 29, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 08, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.