U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLOCKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 25, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 24, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 23, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.