U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JUSTICE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 12, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.