U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOPEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 25, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 17, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.