U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAWS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 10, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 23, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.