U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DABRIEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.