U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00123-3
  • Case Name: USA v. ABDUL-MATEEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • December 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Statement]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 24, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 15, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • June 07, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • April 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment]
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 31, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • March 30, 2021: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.