U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 20, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.