U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • August 10, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • January 11, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 05, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.