U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TITH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED USPO Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 11, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • August 31, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2021: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • July 28, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 15, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.