U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • April 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.