U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lowe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2022: [Annual Accounting of Garnishment]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 16, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 16, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 01, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.