U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 20, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • May 19, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • May 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • May 04, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 11, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 02, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.