U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McIllwain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Restitution Determination]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue Other]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • April 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.