U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAMINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 23, 2021: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 03, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.