U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brandon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue Other]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 27, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.