U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.