U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • July 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time re: Other]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 02, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.