U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Transcript - Voir Dire]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 09, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • May 25, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • May 24, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 06, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judge or Jury Notes]
  • January 06, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • January 05, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Returning Trial Exhibits]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • January 04, 2022: [Jury Selection]
  • January 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Witness List]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Sequester]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • December 28, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 28, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 21, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • December 08, 2021: [Indictment]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 12, 2021: [Contempt Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [Contempt Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Argument Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.