U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • July 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • July 22, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Addendum]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.