U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Barrios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Service by Publication]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 23, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • June 23, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 23, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 17, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 10, 2021: [Continue Other]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 08, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.