U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shannon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue Other]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 27, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.