U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitmire
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • October 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • September 21, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.