U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 10, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 29, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.