U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.