U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 09, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • July 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • July 23, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 05, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 05, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.