U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 18, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.