U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fetherson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • June 02, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.