U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drysdale
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • October 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2021: [Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue Other]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 08, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.