U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kakenowash
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • October 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2021: [Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.